Kiel James Patrick, LLC et al v. Feishuang et al
Plaintiff: Kiel James Patrick, LLC and Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Gu Feishuang, Cloudflare, Inc., PayPal, Inc. and GoDaddy.com, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00595
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gu Feishuang (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by All Plaintiffs as to Gu Feishuang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Pare, Edward)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/17/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Mary S. McElroy: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2019 re #1 Complaint & Request for Injunctive Relief and #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kiel James Patrick, LLC, Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC. Present: Christopher Joseph Fragomeni and Edward D. Pare, III for the plaintiffs; Deft not present. Arguments heard. The Court grants the plaintiff's request for injunctive relief and temporary restraining order for the reasons set forth in open court. Plaintiff's counsel to provide final order for review. Recess. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Kiel James Patrick, LLC, Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC ; Gu Feishuang served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fragomeni, Christopher)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of GoDaddy.com, LLC - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/4/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (McGuire, Vickie)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Oral Motion for Extension of Time Temporary Restraining Order. - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/3/2019. (McGuire, Vickie) (Main Document 21 replaced on 12/3/2019) (McGuire, Vickie).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Alternative Service. - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/3/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
December 3, 2019 Oral MOTION for an Extension of Time of Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/17/2019. (McGuire, Vickie)
December 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Mary S. McElroy: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2019 re #19 MOTION for Alternative Service Electronic Mail filed by Kiel James Patrick, LLC, Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC. Edward Pare & Christopher Fragomeni for Plaintiff. Defendant not present. Plaintiffs present argument to the court. Plaintiff Oral Motions Court to extend the TRO for 14 days. For reasons stated in today's hearing, the Court grants ECF#19 Motion for Alternative Service including the complaint and summons and grants the Oral Motion to extend the TRO for 14 days during which time the domain is to be transferred to the Plaintiff. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Denise Veitch in Courtroom 2 at 2:00 pm.) (McGuire, Vickie)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing re: #8 Order granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 12/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (Simoncelli, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Alternative Service Electronic Mail filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(Pare, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC, Kiel James Patrick, LLC Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of GoDaddy.com, LLC (Pare, Edward)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Cloudflare, Inc.; entering #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to PayPal, Inc. - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/27/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) Modified on 11/27/2019 (Urizandi, Nisshy).
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC, Kiel James Patrick, LLC Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of PayPal, Inc. (Pare, Edward)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC, Kiel James Patrick, LLC Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Cloudflare, Inc. (Pare, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kiel James Patrick, LLC. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing re: #8 Order granting Motion for Temporary Retraining Order scheduled for Tuesday, 12/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Request filed by Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC, Kiel James Patrick, LLC. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Request filed by Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC, Kiel James Patrick, LLC. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Request filed by Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC, Kiel James Patrick, LLC. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC, Kiel James Patrick, LLC. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Temporary Retraining Order and Setting Hearing in 14 days - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/19/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 18, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Telephonic Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. The Court will initiate the call. Parties are to provide their contact information to the case manager at Nisshy_Urizandi@rid.uscourts.gov. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 16, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT Regarding Rule 65(b)(1)(B) by All Plaintiffs. (Pare, Edward)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs are directed to provide an updated certification specifying efforts made to comply with Rule 65(b)(1)(B) by Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/15/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, #1 Complaint, and Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 15, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1446231 ), filed by Kiel James Patrick, LLC, Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs are directed to provide an updated certification specifying efforts made to comply with Rule 65(b)(1)(B) by Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/15/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, #1 Complaint, and Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 15, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Fragomeni, Christopher)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1446231 ), filed by Kiel James Patrick, LLC, Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Fragomeni, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiel James Patrick, LLC et al v. Feishuang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiel James Patrick, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fragomeni
Represented By: Edward D. Pare, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiel James Patrick Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fragomeni
Represented By: Edward D. Pare, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gu Feishuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloudflare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?