In Re Frank Teixeira, as Owner of M/V AT LAST
In Re: Frank Teixeira
Claimant: RI Department of Environmental Management
Case Number: 1:2019cv00602
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina A. Hoefsmit on behalf of RI Department of Environmental Management (Hoefsmit, Christina)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 CORRECTED NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from or limitation of liability. This NOTICE replaces ECF #6 and corrects the bar date to 3/2/20 (Barletta, Barbara)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Frank Teixeira of Complaint for exoneration from or limitation of liability. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING SUITS - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/31/2019) (Barletta, Barbara).
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER adopting #4 Report and Recommendations - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING SUITS filed by Frank Teixeira. I recommend that the Court order that all lawsuits, causes of action, and claims against Plaintiff and his property arising or resulting from the collision between his vessel and the catamaran on August 11, 2019, shall cease pursuant to 46 U.S.C. 30511(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. Supp. F(3). In addition, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Supp. F(4), I recommend that the Court direct issuance of notice to all persons asserting claims with respect to the August 11, 2019, collision. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2019.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/16/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
December 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 12/11/2019 with Attorney Kirby Aarsheim. (Chambers at 9:38.) (Saucier, Martha)
December 9, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with all counsel of record regarding #3 MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING SUITS. Court to initiate the call.(Saucier, Martha)
December 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING SUITS referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING SUITS filed by Frank Teixeira. Responses due by 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Aarsheim, Kirby)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1447740 ), filed by Frank Teixeira. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 KLOPMAN DECLARATION, #3 STIPULATION RE SECURITY)(Aarsheim, Kirby)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1447740 ), filed by Frank Teixeira. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 KLOPMAN DECLARATION, #3 STIPULATION RE SECURITY)(Aarsheim, Kirby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Frank Teixeira, as Owner of M/V AT LAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Frank Teixeira
Represented By: Kirby L. Aarsheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: RI Department of Environmental Management
Represented By: Christina A. Hoefsmit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?