CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Boghossian, III et al
Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Defendant: David M. Boghossian, Jennifer C. Boghosssian and Paul O. Boghossian, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv00604
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #14 Stipulation to Extend Time. David M. Boghossian(Individually and as Custodian Under Rhode Island Uniform Transfer to Minors Act for: Alexander Candler Boghossian; Christopher Cushman Boghossian; and Elizabeth Alden Boghossian) answer due 1/27/2020; David M. Boghossian(Individually and as Trustee of: The Alexander Chandler Boghossian Trust; The Elizabeth Alden Boghossian Trust; The Christopher Cushman Boghossian Trust) answer due 1/27/2020; Paul O. Boghossian, III answer due 1/27/2020; Jennifer C. Boghosssian answer due 1/27/2020.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/15/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 Assented STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond or Answer the Plaintiff's Complaint to January 27, 2020 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ennis, John)
January 6, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #13 Order to Show Cause. This order was filed in the wrong case and should be disregarded. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered. Show Cause Response due by 1/17/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/27/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #12 Stipulation. The Defendants shall have up to and including 1/13/2020 to file their answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/27/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 Assented STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, To Extend the Time for Defendants to Answer or otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 13, 2020 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ennis, John)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service-D. Boghossian Custodian Under RIUTMA for Christopher Cushman Boghossian, #2 Proof of Service-D. Boghossian Custodian Under RIUTMA for Elizabeth Alden Boghossian)(Tadesse, Krystle)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. David M. Boghossian(Individually and as Trustee of: The Alexander Chandler Boghossian Trust; The Elizabeth Alden Boghossian Trust; The Christopher Cushman Boghossian Trust) served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service-D. Boghossian Trustee of Alexander Chandler Boghossian Trust, #2 Proof of Service-D. Boghossian Trustee of Elizabeth Alden Boghossian Trust, #3 Proof of Service-D. Boghossian Trustee of Christopher Cushman Boghossian Trust)(Tadesse, Krystle)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. Jennifer C. Boghosssian served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Tadesse, Krystle)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. Paul O. Boghossian, III served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Tadesse, Krystle)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Farside, Jr. on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc. (Farside, Joseph)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CitiMortgage, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Citibank, N.A., Corporate Parent Citigroup, Inc., Corporate Parent Citicorp LLC for CitiMortgage, Inc... (Tadesse, Krystle)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Ankrom on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by CitiMortgage, Inc. in support of #1 Complaint, Exhibit A - Note. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Mortgage)(Tadesse, Krystle)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1447827 ), filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Tadesse, Krystle)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Ankrom on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by CitiMortgage, Inc. in support of #1 Complaint, Exhibit A - Note. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Mortgage)(Tadesse, Krystle)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1447827 ), filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Tadesse, Krystle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Boghossian, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Boghossian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer C. Boghosssian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul O. Boghossian, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?