Laccinole v. Appriss, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Defendant: Appriss, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00605
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response re #7 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Appriss, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zurbuch, Alex)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Christopher Laccinole. Replies due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Appriss, Inc.. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Shindell, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alex J. Zurbuch. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/26/2019. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Appriss, Inc.. (Shindell, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Alex J. Zurbuch to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1451354 ) filed by Appriss, Inc.. (Shindell, Robert)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0540. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1448007, filed by Appriss, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shindell, Robert)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2019-0540. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1448007, filed by Appriss, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shindell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laccinole v. Appriss, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appriss, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Shindell
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?