O'Neil et al v. Neronha et al
Plaintiff: Michael P. O'Neil and Nicola Grasso
Defendant: Peter F. Neronha and James M. Manni
Case Number: 1:2019cv00612
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer James M. Manni answer due 1/24/2020; Peter F. Neronha answer due 1/24/2020.. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/15/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 Second MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 1/29/2020. (Wyman, Julia)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer James M. Manni answer due 1/16/2020; Peter F. Neronha answer due 1/16/2020. ; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/17/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer , MOTION for an Extension of Time filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 12/30/2019. (Wyman, Julia)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alan Alexander Beck, ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen D Stamboulieh. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/2/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Stephen D. Stamboulieh to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1451966 ) filed by Michael P. O'Neil. (Saccoccio, Frank)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Alan Alexander Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1451963 ) filed by Michael P. O'Neil. (Saccoccio, Frank)
November 29, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Michael P. O'Neil James M. Manni served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Saccoccio, Frank)
November 29, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Michael P. O'Neil Peter F. Neronha served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Saccoccio, Frank)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James M. Manni, Peter F. Neronha. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1449449 ), filed by Michael P. O'Neil, Nicola Grasso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Saccoccio, Frank)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James M. Manni, Peter F. Neronha. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1449449 ), filed by Michael P. O'Neil, Nicola Grasso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Saccoccio, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neil et al v. Neronha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. O'Neil
Represented By: Frank R. Saccoccio
Represented By: Stephen D Stamboulieh
Represented By: Alan Alexander Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicola Grasso
Represented By: Frank R. Saccoccio
Represented By: Stephen D Stamboulieh
Represented By: Alan Alexander Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter F. Neronha
Represented By: Julia C. Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Manni
Represented By: Julia C. Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?