Nalls-Miles v. Broadwell
Plaintiff: Deanna M. Nalls-Miles
Defendant: David Broadwell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00621
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for failure to comply with #4 Order directing the plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days -- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/14/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing #1 Complaint and denying as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order or the case will be dismissed without prejudice- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/2/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Deanna M. Nalls-Miles. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Deanna M. Nalls-Miles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, Alyson)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Deanna M. Nalls-Miles. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Deanna M. Nalls-Miles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nalls-Miles v. Broadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Broadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna M. Nalls-Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?