Stewart v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Genevra Stewart
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00624
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking #here - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/16/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery shall be completed by 9/14/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be completed by 10/14/2020; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be completed by 11/13/2020; Expert Discovery shall be completed by 12/14/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 1/13/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/15/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Mary S. McElroy: Rule 16 Conference held on 1/13/2020. Present: Robert E. Savage for the plaintiff and Dylan A. Farmer (participated telephonically) and Thomas W. Lyons, III for the defendant. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware) for United Parcel Service, Inc... (Schmoyer, Shannon)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Genevra Stewart. (Savage, Robert)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shannon B. Schmoyer (Schmoyer, Shannon)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 11:00 AM in Judge McElroy's Chambers before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shannon Schmoyer ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dylan Farmer. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/5/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Dylan A. Farmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1453257 ) filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Shannon B. Schmoyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1453256 ) filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Lyons, Thomas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson) Date Filed Modified on 12/5/2019 (Hicks, Alyson).
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-1210. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1451187, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Served Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - State Court Entry of Appearance, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Entity Summary, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Thomas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-1210. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1451187, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Served Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - State Court Entry of Appearance, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Entity Summary, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Represented By: Dylan A. Farmer
Represented By: Shannon B. Schmoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevra Stewart
Represented By: Robert E. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?