Robert E. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Robert Ewing
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00628
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Ewing. I recommend that PlaintiffsMotion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF No. 3) be DENIED and that Plaintiff be directed to pay the filing fee within thirty days of the adoption of this recommendation. If Plaintiff does not pay the filing fee, I recommend that the case be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2020.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/15/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Ewing. On or before January 8, 2020, Plaintiff is directed to supplement his financial affidavit with additional information about the value of his residence and the amount of balance due on the mortgage, who else is involved in paying the mortgage or other expenses of the building (insurance, taxes), and any other information pertinent to his claim of financial desperation. The Court will rule on the motion once the supplemental financial affidavit is received.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/18/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
December 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis J. George on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (George, Louis)
November 27, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)(Spunzo, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Robert Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spunzo, David)
November 27, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)(Spunzo, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Robert Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spunzo, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert E. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ewing
Represented By: David F. Spunzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Louis J. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?