Brown v. Granite APR Development Corp.
Plaintiff: Christopher E. Brown
Defendant: Granite APR Development Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00635
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation to extend time; Reset Deadlines: Granite APR Development Corp. answer due 2/24/2020 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/22/2020(Barletta, Barbara)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation allowing the Defendant additional time to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Granite APR Development Corp.. (Jestings, Alexander)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander W. Jestings on behalf of Granite APR Development Corp. (Jestings, Alexander)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd J. Romano on behalf of Granite APR Development Corp. (Romano, Todd)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher E. Brown. Granite APR Development Corp. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Barrett, Kensley)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Granite APR Development Corp.. (Potter, Carrie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 4, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1453125 ), filed by Christopher E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Barrett, Kensley)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Granite APR Development Corp.. (Potter, Carrie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 4, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1453125 ), filed by Christopher E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Barrett, Kensley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Granite APR Development Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher E. Brown
Represented By: Kensley R. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite APR Development Corp.
Represented By: Todd J. Romano
Represented By: Alexander W. Jestings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?