Sellers v. City of Newport, by and through its Director of Finance, Laura Sitrin
Plaintiff: Maurice Sellers
Defendant: City of Newport
Case Number: 1:2019cv00638
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Maurice Sellers. City of Newport waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Formisano, V.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Reynolds on behalf of All Defendants (Reynolds, Mark)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 5, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1453640 ), filed by Maurice Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 5, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1453640 ), filed by Maurice Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellers v. City of Newport, by and through its Director of Finance, Laura Sitrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Sellers
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newport
Represented By: Mark T. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?