Correa v. Hawkins
Plaintiff: Carmen Correa
Defendant: Courtney Hawkins
Case Number: 1:2019cv00656
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the parties, the TRO is extended in full force and effect until further Order of the Court and that the time for the Defendant to fulfill the requirements set forth in paragraph 2 of the TRO is extended to February 7, 2020 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/31/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 31, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 12:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Saucier, Martha)
January 31, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2020 with Attorneys Lynette J. Labinger, Ellen M. Saideman, Brenda Baum, Sean Lyness, Deborah Barclay and Iwona Ramian. (Chambers at 11:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in support of #13 Objection to #5 MOTION to Certify Class . ; Set/Reset Deadlines: Memorandum due by 2/27/2020. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/27/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 11:00 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with counsel of record to discuss scheduling of settlement conference. Court to initiate the call. (Saucier, Martha)
January 24, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan to conduct a Settlement Conference. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Courtney Hawkins. Responses due by 2/7/2020. (Baum, Brenda)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the parties, the TRO is extended in full force and effect until further Order of the Court and that the time for the Defendant to fulfill the requirements set forth in paragraph 2 of the TRO is extended to January 31, 2020 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/14/2020 (Barletta, Barbara)
January 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: In Chambers Conference held on 1/13/2020; Lynette J. Labinger, Ellen M. Saideman, Brenda D. Baum, Sean H. Lyness and Deborah Barclay (DHS) present (Barletta, Barbara)
January 9, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference set for Monday, 1/13/2020 at 02:00 PM in Judge McConnell's Chambers (Barletta, Barbara)
January 9, 2020 HEARING CANCELLED: The Preliminary Injunction hearing scheduled for Monday, 1/13/20 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File to file a response to #5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Carmen Correa; Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/27/2020. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Vacate Text Order granting #5 Motion to Certify Class - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Vacate Order on Motion to Certify Class filed by Courtney Hawkins. Responses due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Baum, Brenda)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Vacate Order on Motion to Certify Class filed by Courtney Hawkins. Responses due by 1/13/2020. (Baum, Brenda)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File MISO of Objection to Motion for Class Certification filed by Courtney Hawkins. Responses due by 1/13/2020. (Baum, Brenda)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Courtney Hawkins. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Baum, Brenda)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #5 Motion to Certify Class. Plaintiff shall prepare and submit a form of order, in consultation with the Defendant- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/30/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for Monday, 1/13/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.(Barletta, Barbara)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER issued by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. granting #4 Motion for Temporary Retraining Order. (Perry, Frank)
December 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic TRO Conference held on 12/18/2019; Lynette J. Labinger, Ellen Saideman, Brenda Baum and Sean Lyness participated (Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky.) (Barletta, Barbara)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Opposition to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 12/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(Baum, Brenda)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean H. Lyness on behalf of Courtney Hawkins (Lyness, Sean)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda D. Baum on behalf of Courtney Hawkins (Baum, Brenda)
December 16, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic TRO Conference set for Wednesday,12/18/2019 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate the call. Kindly provide clerk at 401-752-7202 with telephone contact information if it differs from the docket sheet (Barletta, Barbara)
December 14, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Carmen Correa in support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 Declaration, #5 MOTION to Certify Class Carmen Correa by Carmen Correa. (Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #5 MOTION to Certify Class , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Mary Curtin by All Plaintiffs. (Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 12/27/2019.) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynette J. Labinger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Labinger, Lynette)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1456281 ), filed by Carmen Correa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 waiver)(Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 Declaration, #5 MOTION to Certify Class Carmen Correa by Carmen Correa. (Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #5 MOTION to Certify Class , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Mary Curtin by All Plaintiffs. (Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 12/27/2019.) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Saideman, Ellen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynette J. Labinger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Labinger, Lynette)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1456281 ), filed by Carmen Correa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 waiver)(Saideman, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correa v. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Correa
Represented By: Lynette J. Labinger
Represented By: Ellen M. Saideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Hawkins
Represented By: Sean H. Lyness
Represented By: Brenda D. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?