Gauthier v. Alexion Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Gauthier
Defendant: Alexion Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00657
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Christopher Gauthier (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Formisano, V.) Modified on 1/29/2020 (Potter, Carrie).
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Gauthier. Alexion Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Formisano, V.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1458325 ), filed by Christopher Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1458325 ), filed by Christopher Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gauthier v. Alexion Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gauthier
Represented By: Nicole J. Policastro
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexion Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?