Faye v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Moustapha Faye
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00671
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #6 Response to Motion, Defendant's Motion to Oppose Injunction filed by Moustapha Faye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Faye, Moustapha)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #2 MOTION Request for Injunction; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Replies due by 3/4/2020. Responses due by 3/4/2020. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/4/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Response to Motion, re. request for injunction filed by Moustapha Faye. Responses due by 2/18/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Moustapha Faye. Responses due by 2/18/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/27/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Quicken Loans, Inc.. Responses due by 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit B-State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-State Court MTD, #5 Exhibit D-State Court Judgment)(Robinson, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE In Opposition to #2 MOTION Request for Injunction filed by Quicken Loans, Inc.. Replies due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D-Judgment)(Robinson, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moustapha Faye. Quicken Loans, Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by Moustapha Faye. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Request for Injunction filed by Moustapha Faye. Responses due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670023233 ), filed by Moustapha Faye. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as Pro Se Electronic Filer filed by Moustapha Faye. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Request for Injunction filed by Moustapha Faye. Responses due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670023233 ), filed by Moustapha Faye. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faye v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moustapha Faye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?