PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. Weston et al
Plaintiff: PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Defendant: Esq. Geralyn M. Cook, Jason Weston, Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation, Jodie Weston, Unifund CCR, LLC and Attorney Geralyn M. Cook
Case Number: 1:2020cv00011
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Geralyn M. Cook.(Cook, Geralyn)
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant RIHousing ANSWER to Complaint with Certificate of Service by Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation.(Raucci, Cristen)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Jodie Weston served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Jason Weston served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Geralyn M. Cook served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Unifund CCR, LLC served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Eastwood, Catherine)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Geralyn M. Cook, Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation, Unifund CCR, LLC, Jason Weston, Jodie Weston. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 8, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.. (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1462384 ), filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Jason Weston, #4 Summons - Jodie Weston, #5 Summons - RI Housing, #6 Summons - Unifund CCR LLC, #7 Summons - Geralyn M. Cook)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1462384 ), filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Jason Weston, #4 Summons - Jodie Weston, #5 Summons - RI Housing, #6 Summons - Unifund CCR LLC, #7 Summons - Geralyn M. Cook)(O'Shaughnessy, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. Weston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Geralyn M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation
Represented By: Cristen L. Raucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodie Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifund CCR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Geralyn M. Cook
Represented By: Geralyn M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHH Mortgage Corporation successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Eileen C. O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?