Hendrickson v. Navigant Credit Union
Plaintiff: Marissa M Hendrickson
Defendant: Navigant Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2020cv00021
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
2 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Enlarging Time to Respond filed by Navigant Credit Union. (Snow, Steven)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Snow on behalf of Navigant Credit Union (Snow, Steven)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marissa M Hendrickson. Navigant Credit Union served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Solar, Lauren)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Navigant Credit Union. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. (Solar, Lauren)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Tropin. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/23/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Daniel Tropin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1467454 ) filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. (Solar, Lauren)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered: Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge William E. Smith for all further proceedings- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Solar, Lauren)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1465154 ), filed by Marissa M Hendrickson.(Solar, Lauren)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Marissa M Hendrickson. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Solar, Lauren)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1465154 ), filed by Marissa M Hendrickson.(Solar, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrickson v. Navigant Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigant Credit Union
Represented By: Steven E. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa M Hendrickson
Represented By: Lauren A. Solar
Represented By: Daniel Tropin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?