Linkevich v. Smithfield Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Linkevich
Defendant: Smithfield Foods, Inc. and Smithfield Packaged Meats Sales Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00022
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Saucier, Martha)
March 4, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrea R. Calem. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/6/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kimberlee W. DeWitt. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/6/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Andrea R. Calem to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1472254 ) filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats Sales Corp.. (Shank, Jonathan)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Kimberlee W. DeWitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1472251 ) filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats Sales Corp.. (Shank, Jonathan)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/3/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats Sales Corp..(Shank, Jonathan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Linkevich. All Defendants. (Kirwan, Charles)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Linkevich. All Defendants. (Kirwan, Charles)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibit in Support #4 Amended Complaint filed by Richard Linkevich.(Kirwan, Charles) Modified on 1/21/2020 to fix document description(Potter, Carrie).
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Richard Linkevich.(Kirwan, Charles)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-1420. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1465660, filed by Smithfield Packaged Meats Sales Corp., Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court filings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shank, Jonathan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number KC-2019-1420. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1465660, filed by Smithfield Packaged Meats Sales Corp., Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court filings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shank, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linkevich v. Smithfield Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Linkevich
Represented By: Charles S. Kirwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Packaged Meats Sales Corp.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?