Federal National Mortgage Association v. Paddock et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Keri Beth Paddock and Matthew D. Paddock
Case Number: 1:2020cv00059
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Keri Beth Paddock, Matthew D. Paddock (Hicks, Alyson)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #10 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default Affidavit as to Military Service and Competency by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Federal National Mortgage Association as to Keri Beth Paddock, Matthew D. Paddock. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Keri Beth Paddock served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Matthew D. Paddock served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Keri Beth Paddock, Matthew D. Paddock. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
February 6, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Federal National Mortgage Association re #1 Complaint, Notice of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1472285 ), filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 3 - AOM, #4 Exhibit 4 - Demands, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pay History, #6 Exhibit 6 - Accel Letters, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Eastwood, Catherine)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
February 6, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Federal National Mortgage Association re #1 Complaint, Notice of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (Eastwood, Catherine)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1472285 ), filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 3 - AOM, #4 Exhibit 4 - Demands, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pay History, #6 Exhibit 6 - Accel Letters, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Eastwood, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Paddock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keri Beth Paddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D. Paddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Catherine V. Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?