Sequin, LLC v. Kimberly Renk, et al.
Plaintiff: Sequin, LLC
Defendant: Kimberly Renk and John Doe Corp. d/b/a Sequin, Kimberly Renk and John Doe Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00062
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/6/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Document - Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Kimberly Renk. Responses due by 4/10/2020. (Keough, Timothy)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #11 Response to Motion of Reena Jane in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Sequin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Cardosi, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #11 Response to Motion of Richard J. Renk, Jr. In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Sequin, LLC. (Cardosi, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Support to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sequin, LLC. Replies due by 4/1/2020. (Cardosi, Matthew)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 First RESPONSE In Opposition to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kimberly Renk. Replies due by 3/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Kimberly Renk, With Exhibits Thereto, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Keough, Timothy)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J Keough on behalf of Kimberly Renk (Keough, Timothy)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation Enlarging Time to Respond to Preliminary Injunction up to 3/13/2020 and replies up to 3/25/2020. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/4/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Kimberly Renk OF RELATED DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keough, Timothy)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 Assented STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Kimberly Renk. (Keough, Timothy)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sequin, LLC. Kimberly Renk waiver sent on 2/11/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Cardosi, Matthew)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sequin, LLC. (Cardosi, Matthew)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Reena Jain. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/10/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
February 10, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sequin, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Sequin, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Cardosi, Matthew)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Reena Jain to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1472908 ) filed by Sequin, LLC. (Cardosi, Matthew)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1472905 ), filed by Sequin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Registration, #2 Exhibit Notices of Acknowledgment, #3 Exhibit Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cardosi, Matthew)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sequin, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Sequin, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Cardosi, Matthew)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Reena Jain to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1472908 ) filed by Sequin, LLC. (Cardosi, Matthew)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1472905 ), filed by Sequin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Registration, #2 Exhibit Notices of Acknowledgment, #3 Exhibit Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cardosi, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sequin, LLC v. Kimberly Renk, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequin, LLC
Represented By: Matthew P. Cardosi
Represented By: Reena Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Renk and John Doe Corp. d/b/a Sequin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Renk
Represented By: Timothy J Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?