United States of America v. Park Square Urgent Care et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Advanced Urgent Care, Biltmore Medical, Rhode Island Health Group, LLC, Biltmore Medical A, Primacare, Inc, Park Square Urgent Care, Inc. and Zaheer Shah, MD
Case Number: 1:2020cv00110
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Advanced Urgent Care, Biltmore Medical, Biltmore Medical A, Park Square Urgent Care, Inc., Primacare, Inc, Zaheer Shah, MD Withdrawal of David Honig (Honig, David)
April 27, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Friday on behalf of Advanced Urgent Care, Biltmore Medical, Biltmore Medical A, Park Square Urgent Care, Inc., Primacare, Inc, Zaheer Shah, MD (Friday, Kimberly)
April 24, 2020 Filing 21 Second MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Advanced Urgent Care, Biltmore Medical, Biltmore Medical A, Park Square Urgent Care, Inc., Primacare, Inc, Rhode Island Health Group, LLC, Zaheer Shah, MD. Responses due by 5/8/2020. (Traini, Anthony)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kimberly Friday. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/24/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
April 24, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Kimberly Friday to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1495770 ) filed by Advanced Urgent Care, Biltmore Medical, Biltmore Medical A, Park Square Urgent Care, Inc., Primacare, Inc, Zaheer Shah, MD. (Traini, Anthony)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Advanced Urgent Care answer due 4/29/2020; Biltmore Medical answer due 4/29/2020; Biltmore Medical A answer due 4/29/2020; Park Square Urgent Care, Inc. answer due 4/29/2020; Primacare, Inc answer due 4/29/2020; Zaheer Shah, MD answer due 4/29/2020. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/30/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Advanced Urgent Care, Biltmore Medical, Biltmore Medical A, Park Square Urgent Care, Inc., Primacare, Inc, Zaheer Shah, MD. Responses due by 4/2/2020. (Traini, Anthony)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David B. Honig. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/17/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for David B. Honig to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1484346 ) filed by Advanced Urgent Care, Biltmore Medical, Biltmore Medical A, Park Square Urgent Care, Inc., Primacare, Inc, Zaheer Shah, MD. (Traini, Anthony)
March 13, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Zaheer Shah, MD served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Wong, Bethany)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Rhode Island Health Group, LLC served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Wong, Bethany)
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Primacare, Inc served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Wong, Bethany)
March 13, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Park Square Urgent Care, Inc. served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Wong, Bethany)
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Biltmore Medical served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Wong, Bethany)
March 13, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Advanced Urgent Care served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Wong, Bethany)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Biltmore Medical A served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Advanced Urgent Care, Biltmore Medical, Biltmore Medical A, Park Square Urgent Care, Inc., Primacare, Inc, Rhode Island Health Group, LLC, United States of America, Zaheer Shah, MD. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Advanced Urgent Care, Biltmore Medical, Biltmore Medical A, Park Square Urgent Care, Inc., Primacare, Inc, Rhode Island Health Group, LLC, United States of America, Zaheer Shah, MD. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Wong, Bethany)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wong, Bethany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Park Square Urgent Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Urgent Care
Represented By: David B. Honig
Represented By: Kimberly Friday
Represented By: Anthony M. Traini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biltmore Medical
Represented By: David B. Honig
Represented By: Kimberly Friday
Represented By: Anthony M. Traini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Health Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biltmore Medical A
Represented By: David B. Honig
Represented By: Kimberly Friday
Represented By: Anthony M. Traini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primacare, Inc
Represented By: David B. Honig
Represented By: Kimberly Friday
Represented By: Anthony M. Traini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Square Urgent Care, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Honig
Represented By: Kimberly Friday
Represented By: Anthony M. Traini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaheer Shah, MD
Represented By: David B. Honig
Represented By: Kimberly Friday
Represented By: Anthony M. Traini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bethany N. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?