Wojcik v. Kent County Memorial Hospital
Plaintiff: Elaine Wojcik
Defendant: Kent County Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 1:2020cv00114
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kent County Memorial Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Care New England Health System for Kent County Memorial Hospital.. (Parker, Matthew)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by Kent County Memorial Hospital.(Parker, Matthew)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Whelan on behalf of Kent County Memorial Hospital (Whelan, Joseph)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Parker on behalf of Kent County Memorial Hospital (Parker, Matthew)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION filed by Elaine Wojcik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Formisano, V.)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elaine Wojcik. Kent County Memorial Hospital waiver sent on 3/5/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Formisano, V.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1481368 ), filed by Elaine Wojcik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1481368 ), filed by Elaine Wojcik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wojcik v. Kent County Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent County Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Wojcik
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?