Carroll v. Craddock
Plaintiff: Sean M Carroll
Defendant: Walter R Craddock
Case Number: 1:2020cv00126
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION filed by Walter R Craddock. (Shea, Andrea)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #14 Stipulation; entering #17 Stipulation. Replies to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #4 ) due 5/1/2020; Replies to Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #12 ) due by 5/11/2020. - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/1/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION filed by Walter R Craddock. (Shea, Andrea)
April 26, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE In Opposition to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sean M Carroll. Replies due by 5/4/2020. (Lyons, Thomas)
April 26, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re #13 Response to Motion, for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sean M Carroll. (Lyons, Thomas)
April 23, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #13 Response to Motion, Extending Plaintiff's Time to File Reply filed by Sean M Carroll. (Lyons, Thomas)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE In Opposition to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Walter R Craddock. Replies due by 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shea, Andrea)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Walter R Craddock. Responses due by 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Shea, Andrea)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #11 Stipulation, #9 Stipulation. The Defendant shall have up to and including 4/17/2020 to file a response to #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/9/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 Second STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lyons, Thomas)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sean M Carroll. Walter R Craddock waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lyons, Thomas)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Walter R Craddock. (Shea, Andrea)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Walter R Craddock. (Potter, Carrie)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Sean M Carroll. (Lyons, Thomas)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Field on behalf of Walter R Craddock (Field, Michael)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Shea on behalf of Walter R Craddock (Shea, Andrea)
March 12, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference re: #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 3/13/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Sean M Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Sean Carroll, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Brown)(Lyons, Thomas)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
March 12, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhiannon S. Huffman on behalf of Sean M Carroll (Huffman, Rhiannon)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1483201 ), filed by Sean M Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Craddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R Craddock
Represented By: Michael W. Field
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M Carroll
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Represented By: Rhiannon S. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?