Littlefield v. Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc. f/k/a Custom Leathercraft Mfg., LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Littlefield
Defendant: Stephens Capital Partners, LLC and Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00136
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephens Capital Partners, LLC. Responses due by 5/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1 - Sec. State Records, #3 Exhibit 2 - Sec. State Records 2, #4 Appendix Supporting Caselaw - Hainey, #5 Appendix Supporting Caselaw - Diving Services, #6 Appendix Supporting Caselaw - Daynard)(Wray, William)
May 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William K. Wray, Jr. on behalf of Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc. (Wray, William)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc.. Responses due by 5/27/2020. (Beretta, Richard)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Beretta, Jr. on behalf of Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc. (Beretta, Richard)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc. answer due 5/15/2020. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/23/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc.. Responses due by 4/28/2020. (Ruggieri, James)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Ruggieri on behalf of Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc. (Ruggieri, James)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Stephens Capital Partners, LLC answer due 5/14/2020.. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/8/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William K. Wray, Jr. on behalf of Stephens Capital Partners, LLC (Wray, William)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stephens Capital Partners, LLC. (Beretta, Richard)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Stephens Capital Partners, LLC. Responses due by 4/20/2020. (Beretta, Richard)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Beretta, Jr. on behalf of Stephens Capital Partners, LLC (Beretta, Richard)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc., Stephens Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 18, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by David Littlefield. (Formisano, V.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by David Littlefield. (Formisano, V.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1484636 ), filed by David Littlefield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 3/18/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc., Stephens Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 18, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by David Littlefield. (Formisano, V.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by David Littlefield. (Formisano, V.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1484636 ), filed by David Littlefield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 3/18/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Littlefield v. Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc. f/k/a Custom Leathercraft Mfg., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Littlefield
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Richard R. Beretta, Jr.
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Leathercraft Mfg., Inc.
Represented By: Richard R. Beretta, Jr.
Represented By: William K. Wray, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Ruggieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?