Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB as Owner Trustee of the Residential Opportunities Trust V doing business as Christina Trust
Defendant: Sandra L. Johnson and Randall T Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00138
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The plaintiff shall serve the defendats in this case on or before 12/15/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/26/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for an Extension of Time Enlarge Time to Serve Summons with certificate of service filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Responses due by 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Masterson, Shawn)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Masterson, Shawn)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered. Show Cause Response due by 8/14/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 7/31/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Randall T Johnson, Sandra L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 19, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trsut as Owner Trustee of the Residential Opportunities Trust V. (Masterson, Shawn)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trsut as Owner Trustee of the Residential Opportunities Trust V. (Masterson, Shawn)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB . (Masterson, Shawn) Modified on 3/19/2020 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re #1 Complaint, Notice of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation (Masterson, Shawn) Modified on 3/19/2020 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1484971 ), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Masterson, Shawn) Docket text Modified on 3/19/2020 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Randall T Johnson, Sandra L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 19, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trsut as Owner Trustee of the Residential Opportunities Trust V. (Masterson, Shawn)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trsut as Owner Trustee of the Residential Opportunities Trust V. (Masterson, Shawn)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB . (Masterson, Shawn) Modified on 3/19/2020 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re #1 Complaint, Notice of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation (Masterson, Shawn) Modified on 3/19/2020 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1484971 ), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Masterson, Shawn) Docket text Modified on 3/19/2020 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall T Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Shawn M. Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB as Owner Trustee of the Residential Opportunities Trust V doing business as Christina Trust
Represented By: Shawn M. Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?