Trapassi v. Citizens Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Donna Trapassi
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00150
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER : Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/27/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Millsom, Geoffrey)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Millsom, Geoffrey)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Citizens Bank, N.A. (Millsom, Geoffrey)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenna Anatone Force on behalf of Citizens Bank, N.A. (Force, Brenna)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Trapassi. Citizens Bank, N.A. served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (Formisano, V.)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Citizens Bank, N.A. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Donna Trapassi. (Formisano, V.)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 27, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1486835 ), filed by Donna Trapassi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 3/27/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trapassi v. Citizens Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Trapassi
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Geoffrey W. Millsom
Represented By: Brenna Anatone Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?