Phoenix v. Day One et al
Plaintiff: Simone E Phoenix
Defendant: Day One, James Cryan, Timothy McGann, Dwight Eddy, Philip Hartnett, Brian Dyer, Edmond Esten, City of Providence, Sean Comella, The Providence Center, Inc. and Jeff Richards
Case Number: 1:2020cv00152
Filed: March 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by Simone E Phoenix. Responses due by 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Appendix Proposed Amended Complaint)(Kurland, Shannah)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Day One.(Suryanarayan, Rajaram)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rajaram Suryanarayan on behalf of Day One (Suryanarayan, Rajaram)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Galamaga on behalf of The Providence Center, Inc. (Galamaga, Paul)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/13/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by The Providence Center, Inc..(Galamaga, Paul)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Providence Center, Inc.. (Galamaga, Paul)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Galamaga on behalf of The Providence Center, Inc. (Galamaga, Paul)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Sean Comella, James Cryan, Brian Dyer, Dwight Eddy, Edmond Esten, Philip Hartnett, Timothy McGann, Jeff Richards.(Colucci, Michael)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Colucci on behalf of Sean Comella, James Cryan, Brian Dyer, Dwight Eddy, Edmond Esten, Philip Hartnett, Timothy McGann, Jeff Richards (Colucci, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint,. (Potter, Carrie)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Day One and The Providence Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Providence Center Summons)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 30, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 30, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint,. (Potter, Carrie)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Day One and The Providence Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Providence Center Summons)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 30, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 30, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1487199 ), filed by Simone E Phoenix. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(Kurland, Shannah) CLERKS NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the file date. Modified due to Technical Issues on 3/30/2020 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix v. Day One et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day One
Represented By: Rajaram Suryanarayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cryan
Represented By: Michael J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy McGann
Represented By: Michael J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Eddy
Represented By: Michael J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Hartnett
Represented By: Michael J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Dyer
Represented By: Michael J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmond Esten
Represented By: Michael J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Providence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Comella
Represented By: Michael J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Providence Center, Inc.
Represented By: Paul F. Galamaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Richards
Represented By: Michael J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone E Phoenix
Represented By: Shannah M. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?