Thompson v. Hassett et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Mondrez Thompson
Defendant: Garrett S. Hassett and Jeffrey Konieczny
Case Number: 1:2020cv00185
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Letter sent to Anthony Mondrez Thompson requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Anthony Mondrez Thompson. Docket Sheet and complaint mailed on 6/17/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
June 11, 2020 PLRA Filing fee: $ 30.00 received - receipt number 14670029862. Total Amount Paid to date: $30.00. (McGuire, Vickie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Anthony Thompson. Docket Sheet Sent 5/15/20. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Anthony Mondrez Thompson's Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit is GRANTED. However, Mr. Thompson is still required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act, adopted April 25, 1996, and codified at 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), a prisoner seeking to file in forma pauperis must pay, when funds exist, an initial filing fee of the greater of 20% of the average monthly deposits to his account or the average monthly balance for the six months prior to the filing of his complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Subsequently, a prisoner must pay monthly 20% of the previous month's balance in his account. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Mr. Thompson's monthly deposits averaged $150.00 during his time at the Wyatt Detention Facility, as reflected in his Inmate Balance History Report. His average balance during the same period was $41.82. Accordingly, Mr. Thompson is required to pay $30.00 as an initial filing fee. The Wyatt Detention Center is directed to forward to the Court each month 20% of the previous months balance in Mr. Thompson's account each time that amount exceeds $10.00 until he has paid the entire filing fee of $350.00. The United States Marshals Service is hereby ordered to serve the plaintiffs summons and complaint on the defendants - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/11/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Mr. Thompson enclosing Inmate Balance Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Balance Report) (Hicks, Alyson)
April 29, 2020 DOCKET NOTE: A copy of the 4/27/20 Text Order was forwarded to the plaintiff at the Wyatt Detention Facility (Barletta, Barbara)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address to Wyatt Detention Facility, 950 High Street, Central Falls, RI 02863 by Anthony Mondrez Thompson (Hicks, Alyson)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Anthony Mondrez Thompson has filed an Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit (Application) in conjunction with his civil rights action. Although Mr. Thompson has submitted the affidavit required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), he has not submitted a copy of his inmate trust fund statement (or institutional equivalent) obtained from the appropriate official at FMC-Devens, where he is currently incarcerated, as directed by 1915(a)(2). In connection with proceedings in forma pauperis, 1915(e)(2) instructs the Court to dismiss a case at any time if the Court determines that the action, inter alia, fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Without commenting on the merits of Mr. Thompson's arguments, on initial review the Court finds that the Complaint states a claim upon which relief may be granted. Accordingly, the Court directs Mr. Thompson to file a copy of his prisoner trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent), obtained from the appropriate official at FMC-Devens, within 30 days of the date of this order. When the Court receives the inmate account statement, it will rule upon the Application. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/27/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summpons, #3 Envelope)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Mondrez Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summpons, #3 Envelope)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Hassett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mondrez Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett S. Hassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Konieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?