Doe v. Brown University
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Brown University
Case Number: 1:2020cv00191
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response re #19 Response to Motion, for an Order to Show Cause filed by Brown University. (Corrente, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE In Opposition to #13 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiff Should Be Permitted To Proceed Anonymously filed by John Doe. Replies due by 6/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kurowski, Daniel)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. District Judge William E. Smith recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/8/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda M. MacDonald; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Levinstein. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/2/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Mark S. Levinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1508250 ) filed by Brown University. (Corrente, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Amanda M. MacDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1508248 ) filed by Brown University. (Corrente, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's response will be due 30 days after the Defendant's #13 Motion for Order to Show Cause is resolved. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/2/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for an Extension of Time To File Response to Complaint filed by Brown University. Responses due by 6/11/2020. (Corrente, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Brown University in support of #13 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiff Should Be Permitted To Proceed Anonymously . (Corrente, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiff Should Be Permitted To Proceed Anonymously filed by Brown University. Responses due by 6/11/2020. (Corrente, Robert)
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION filed by Brown University. (Corrente, Robert)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clark Corrente on behalf of Brown University (Corrente, Robert)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Brown University served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Prignano, Stephen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Strachman on behalf of John Doe (Strachman, David)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Whitney Siehl. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/5/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Whitney Siehl to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1497984 ) filed by John Doe. (Potter, Carrie)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Brown University. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by John Doe. (Prignano, Stephen)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steve W. Berman ; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Kurowski. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/1/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Brown University. (Potter, Carrie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
April 30, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Daniel J. Kurowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1497982 ) filed by John Doe. (Prignano, Stephen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1497981 ) filed by John Doe. (Prignano, Stephen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1497947 ), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Prignano, Stephen) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/5/2020) (Potter, Carrie).
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Daniel J. Kurowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1497982 ) filed by John Doe. (Prignano, Stephen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1497981 ) filed by John Doe. (Prignano, Stephen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1497947 ), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Prignano, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Brown University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Stephen M. Prignano
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Whitney Siehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University
Represented By: Amanda M. MacDonald
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Mark S. Levinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?