Twin River-Tiverton, LLC v. United Auto Workers, Local #7770
Plaintiff: Twin River-Tiverton, LLC
Defendant: United Auo Workers, Local #7770 and United Auto Workers, Local #7770
Case Number: 1:2020cv00202
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Twin River-Tiverton, LLC. (Chittick, Michael)
July 3, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Gursky, Marc)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 7/8/2020 at 09:15 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Call in instructions will be provided to counsel of record (Barletta, Barbara)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Twin River-Tiverton, LLC.(Chittick, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM to confirm and enforce arbitration award against Twin River-Tiverton, LLC by United Auto Workers, Local #7770.(Gursky, Marc)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Twin River-Tiverton, LLC. United Auo Workers, Local #7770 waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Chittick, Michael)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 5, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 0103-1499473 ) filed by Twin River-Tiverton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 5, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 0103-1499473 ) filed by Twin River-Tiverton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twin River-Tiverton, LLC v. United Auto Workers, Local #7770
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auo Workers, Local #7770
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auto Workers, Local #7770
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin River-Tiverton, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Chittick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?