Cortes v. Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc.
Plaintiff: Edwin Cortes
Defendant: Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00245
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc.. (Khorsand, Ali)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Khorsand on behalf of Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc. (Khorsand, Ali)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Chittick on behalf of Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc. (Chittick, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin Cortes. Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc. served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Enright, Thomas)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 2, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1508111 ), filed by Edwin Cortes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Enright, Thomas)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 2, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1508111 ), filed by Edwin Cortes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Enright, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortes v. Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Cortes
Represented By: Thomas J Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narragansett Jewelry Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?