Rafaelian et al v. LC A&A Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carolyn Rafaelian, Venice Beach Walk, LLC and Alex and Ani Pledge Co.
Defendant: LC A&A Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00247
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint and Ensuing Filing Deadlines filed by A and A Shareholding Co. LLC, Robert Trabucco. (Emanuel, Douglas)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alyson A Cohen. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 7/20/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Alyson A. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1531037 ) filed by LC A&A Holdings, Inc., LC A&A Intermediate Investors LLC, Lyndon Lea. (Oliverio, Matthew)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David I. Horowitz. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 7/9/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
July 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for David I. Horowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1526426 ) filed by A and A Shareholding Co. LLC, Robert Trabucco. (Digou, Andre)
July 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre S. Digou on behalf of A and A Shareholding Co. LLC, Robert Trabucco (Digou, Andre)
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #13 Summons Issued Acceptance of Service, Extending Time to Answer, Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Oliverio, Matthew)
July 6, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LC A&A Holdings, Inc., LC A&A Intermediate Investors LLC identifying Corporate Parent LC A&A Investors, LLC for LC A&A Intermediate Investors LLC; Corporate Parent LC A&A Aggregator LP for LC A&A Holdings, Inc... (Oliverio, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth M. Sacksteder ; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michelle Parikh; granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Juan J. Gascon. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 7/2/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Juan J. Gascon to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1524608 ) filed by LC A&A Holdings, Inc., LC A&A Intermediate Investors LLC, Lyndon Lea. (Oliverio, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Michelle Parikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1524605 ) filed by LC A&A Holdings, Inc., LC A&A Intermediate Investors LLC, Lyndon Lea. (Oliverio, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Elizabeth M. Sacksteder to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1524599 ) filed by LC A&A Holdings, Inc., LC A&A Intermediate Investors LLC, Lyndon Lea. (Oliverio, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Oliverio on behalf of LC A&A Holdings, Inc., LC A&A Intermediate Investors LLC, Lyndon Lea (Oliverio, Matthew)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Carolyn Rafaelian All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Kalberer, Kurt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to A and A Shareholding Co. LLC, LC A&A Intermediate Investors LLC, Lyndon Lea, Robert Trabucco. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Request filed by Alex and Ani Pledge Co., Carolyn Rafaelian. (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Request filed by Alex and Ani Pledge Co., Carolyn Rafaelian. (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Request filed by Alex and Ani Pledge Co., Carolyn Rafaelian. (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by Alex and Ani Pledge Co., Carolyn Rafaelian. (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LC A&A Intermediate Investors LLC, Lyndon Lea, A and A Shareholding Co. LLC, Robert Trabucco, filed by Carolyn Rafaelian.(Kalberer, Kurt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alex and Ani Pledge Co.. (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Carolyn Rafaelian LC A&A Holdings, Inc. served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LC A&A Holdings, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 3, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Carolyn Rafaelian. (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Carolyn Rafaelian. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1509259 ), filed by Carolyn Rafaelian.(Kalberer, Kurt)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LC A&A Holdings, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 3, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Carolyn Rafaelian. (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Carolyn Rafaelian. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Kalberer, Kurt)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1509259 ), filed by Carolyn Rafaelian.(Kalberer, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rafaelian et al v. LC A&A Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Rafaelian
Represented By: Kurt T. Kalberer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice Beach Walk, LLC
Represented By: Kurt T. Kalberer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex and Ani Pledge Co.
Represented By: Kurt T. Kalberer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LC A&A Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?