Cornell v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cornell
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00255
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint . Reset Deadlines: Boston Scientific Corporation answer due 9/10/2020. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/7/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. Responses due by 8/18/2020. (Riordan, Kevin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Riordan on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Riordan, Kevin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. (McGuire, Vickie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Elizabeth Cornell. (Burke, Daniel)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel C Burke ; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Georgiana Boss. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/29/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Georgiana Boss to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1523189 ) filed by Elizabeth Cornell. (Gemma, Mark)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Daniel Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1523179 ) filed by Elizabeth Cornell. (Gemma, Mark)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 11, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1515441 ), filed by Elizabeth Cornell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gemma, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornell v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Kevin M. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cornell
Represented By: Mark W. Gemma
Represented By: Daniel C Burke
Represented By: Georgiana Boss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?