Perkins v. Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica Perkins
Defendant: Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00256
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/23/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc..(Ruggieri, James)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Ruggieri, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Ruggieri on behalf of Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. (Ruggieri, James)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Perkins. Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Foley, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 15, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: 2 Case Assigned/Reassigned. Entry erroneously given a document number. No document attached. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 0103-1516286 ), filed by Jessica Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Ruggieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Perkins
Represented By: John S. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?