Jones v. International Doctors Association et al
Plaintiff: Elvis Wayne Jones
Defendant: International Doctors Association, Texas Government Doctors and U.S. Government Doctors
Case Number: 1:2020cv00309
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing complaint- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/28/2020. (Barletta, Barbara) Modified on 8/28/2020 to remove the word Text. This is not a text order (Barletta, Barbara).
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elvis Wayne Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's #2 Order Directing Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee or file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/12/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the plaintiff to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $400.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 8/6/2020. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/16/2020. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the plaintiff to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $400.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 8/6/2020. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/16/2020. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Elvis Wayne Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. International Doctors Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Doctors Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Government Doctors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Government Doctors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?