Laccinole v. Rausch,Sturm,Israel,Enerson & Hornik LLP et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Defendant: Gregory Enerson, Kenneth Wake, Rausch,Sturm,Israel,Enerson & Hornik LLP, Julie Ann Rausch and Elizabeth Garcia
Case Number: 1:2020cv00312
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 9/11/2020 (McGuire, Vickie).CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY: Document filed in wrong case. Correction made by Clerks Office. No further action is required. See CV20-392.
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE In Opposition to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Wallick, Marc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christopher Laccinole. Responses due by 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 8/14/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Rausch,Sturm,Israel,Enerson & Hornik LLP.(Wallick, Marc)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Julie Ann Rausch.(Wallick, Marc)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rausch,Sturm,Israel,Enerson & Hornik LLP. Responses due by 8/20/2020. (Wallick, Marc)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Gregory Enerson answer due 8/7/2020; Elizabeth Garcia answer due 8/7/2020; Julie Ann Rausch answer due 8/7/2020; Rausch,Sturm,Israel,Enerson & Hornik LLP answer due 8/7/2020; Kenneth Wake answer due 8/7/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 7/30/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 8/3/2020. (Wallick, Marc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Defendants. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, . (Wallick, Marc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case.This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0257. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1530312, filed by Rausch,Sturm,Israel,Enerson & Hornik LLP.(Wallick, Marc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Defendants. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, . (Wallick, Marc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case.This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0257. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1530312, filed by Rausch,Sturm,Israel,Enerson & Hornik LLP.(Wallick, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laccinole v. Rausch,Sturm,Israel,Enerson & Hornik LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Enerson
Represented By: Marc D. Wallick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Wake
Represented By: Marc D. Wallick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rausch,Sturm,Israel,Enerson & Hornik LLP
Represented By: Marc D. Wallick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Ann Rausch
Represented By: Marc D. Wallick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Garcia
Represented By: Marc D. Wallick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?