Murphy et al v. Liberty Mutual Corporation
Plaintiff: Jill Murphy and Glen Murphy
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Corporation doing business as Liberty Mutual Insurance
Counter Claimant: Liberty Mutual Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00313
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 2/26/2021; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/26/2021; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 4/30/2021; Expert Discovery to close by 5/14/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2021; Pretrial Memorandum due 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motions or if no motions are filed by 7/9/2021;. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 9/11/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
September 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.Rule 16 Conference held on 9/11/2020. with Attorneys Kayla OConnor and Lindsay Hamilton ( Telephone Conference at 10:34.) (Saucier, Martha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (O'Connor, Kayla)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment by Glen Murphy.(O'Connor, Kayla)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Corporation. (Reilly, Christopher)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Dial in instructions to be emailed to counsel of record. (Saucier, Martha)
August 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/30/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Liberty Mutual Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hamilton, Lindsay)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Reilly on behalf of Liberty Mutual Corporation (Reilly, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-04512. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1530480, filed by Liberty Mutual Corporation. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 state notice of removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hamilton, Lindsay) (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/17/2020) (Simoncelli, Michael).
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Reilly on behalf of Liberty Mutual Corporation (Reilly, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2020-04512. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1530480, filed by Liberty Mutual Corporation. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 state notice of removal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hamilton, Lindsay) (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/17/2020) (Simoncelli, Michael).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Liberty Mutual Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Murphy
Represented By: Richard E. Palumbo, Jr.
Represented By: Kayla S. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Murphy
Represented By: Richard E. Palumbo, Jr.
Represented By: Kayla S. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Corporation doing business as Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Lindsay N. Hamilton
Represented By: Christopher M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Liberty Mutual Corporation
Represented By: Lindsay N. Hamilton
Represented By: Christopher M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?