Forrest et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Susana Bonadona, Kathryn M. Forrest, Thomas Lamoureux and Larry Rockwell II
Defendant: ACI Worldwide Corp and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00323
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 27 Assented STIPULATION re #24 MOTION to Stay Class Related Proceedings to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Motion to Stay to October 14, 2020 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ennis, John)
September 21, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Dann on behalf of Susana Bonadona, Kathryn M. Forrest, Thomas Lamoureux, Larry Rockwell II (Dann, Marc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Class Related Proceedings filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kelleher, John)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/8/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; Responses due by 10/2/2020. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/8/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACI Worldwide Corp. (Force, Brenna)
August 31, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ACI Worldwide Corp. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Force, Brenna)
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to October 2, 2020 filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/4/2020. (Ennis, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Seal Filed. Notice Sent To: PHH Mortgage Corporation, ACI Worldwide Corp, Susana Bonadona, Kathryn M. Forrest, Thomas Lamoureux, Larry Rockwell II. (Kelleher, John) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G-1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G-2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G-3, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G-4, #12 Exhibit Exhibit G-5, #13 Exhibit Exhibit G-6, #14 Exhibit Exhibit G-7, #15 Exhibit Exhibit G-8, #16 Exhibit Exhibit G-9, #17 Exhibit Exhibit G-10, #18 Exhibit Exhibit G-11, #19 Exhibit Exhibit G-12, #20 Exhibit Exhibit G-13, #21 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit G-14, #22 Exhibit Exhibit H, #23 Exhibit Exhibit H-1, #24 Exhibit Exhibit H-2)(Kelleher, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Kelleher on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Kelleher, John)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alison Gutierrez ; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John P. Passarelli; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Andrews. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/18/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Jennifer L. Andrews to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1540589 ) filed by ACI Worldwide Corp. (Force, Brenna)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for John P. Passarelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1540453 ) filed by ACI Worldwide Corp. (Force, Brenna)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Alison M. Gutierrez to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1540449 ) filed by ACI Worldwide Corp. (Force, Brenna)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time for ACI Worldwide Corp. to Respond to August 31, 2020 filed by ACI Worldwide Corp. (Force, Brenna)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of ACI Worldwide Corp (Millsom, Geoffrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenna Anatone Force on behalf of ACI Worldwide Corp (Force, Brenna)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn M. Forrest, Susana Bonadona, Thomas Lamoureux, Larry Rockwell II. ACI Worldwide Corp served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Ennis, John)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn M. Forrest, Susana Bonadona, Thomas Lamoureux, Larry Rockwell II. PHH Mortgage Corporation served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Ennis, John)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc E. Dann. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/30/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 29, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Marc E. Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1534141 ) referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/29/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1534142 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ennis, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Marc E. Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1534141 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ennis, John)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
July 27, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (McGuire, Vickie)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ACI Worldwide Corp, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Susana Bonadona, Kathryn M. Forrest, Thomas Lamoureux, Larry Rockwell II. (Ennis, John)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Susana Bonadona, Kathryn M. Forrest, Thomas Lamoureux, Larry Rockwell II. (Ennis, John)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint, . (Ennis, John)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1532970 ), filed by Kathryn M. Forrest, Susana Bonadona, Thomas Lamoureux, Larry Rockwell II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Ennis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forrest et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACI Worldwide Corp
Represented By: Jennifer Andrews
Represented By: Brenna Anatone Force
Represented By: Geoffrey W. Millsom
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Alison Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: John F. Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Bonadona
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn M. Forrest
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lamoureux
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Rockwell II
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?