Santos v. Johnson and Wales University et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos and Courtney Ciao
Defendant: Matthew Parker, Johnson and Wales University, Stephanie Ann Dixon and West Warwick Police Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv00335
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER adopting #12 Report and Recommendations; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot 25 Motion for TRO; and, dismissing the matter. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/25/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 36 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos received on 8/24/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 24, 2020 Filing 35 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos received on 8/24/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 24, 2020 Filing 34 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos in support of #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
August 21, 2020 Filing 33 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos in support of #17 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McGuire, Vickie)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan for all further referrals. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/21/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 20, 2020 Filing 31 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos received on 8/20/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2020 Filing 29 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos received on 8/20/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2020 Filing 28 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos in support of #1 Complaint. Copy of ECF #23 received. (Attachments: #1 Email received)(Potter, Carrie)
August 20, 2020 Filing 27 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos received on 8/20/2020. Email contained copies of ECF #22, ECF#23 and ECF #25 (Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos received on 8/19/2020. Email contained copies of ECF#23 and ECF #24. (Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 24 Letter from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Attachments: #1 Email received, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (Potter, Carrie)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos re: New Case: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Email received)(Potter, Carrie)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. re : #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Email received)(Potter, Carrie)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos on 8/18/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos on 8/18/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Email Received)(Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Copy of R&R, #2 Email)(Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 Email received from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos on 8/17/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos received on 8/15/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR SUMMARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii), I further recommend that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF Doc. No. 1) be DISMISSED without prejudice. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos ( Objections to R&R due by 8/26/2020.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/12/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Email received)(Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos received on 8/10/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos on 8/10/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 Email from Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos on 8/10/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 DOCKET NOTE: Copies of ECF #1 and #3 received via email on 8/9/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos in support of #1 Complaint. CLERKS NOTE: Remote electronic access to the Attachment #2 has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Potter, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2020: #6 Email) (Potter, Carrie).
August 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Third MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #3 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for Report and Recommendation to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 6, 2020 DOCKET NOTE: Duplicates of ECF #1 and #3 received via email on 8/6/2020 (Potter, Carrie)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Third MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Attachments: #1 Email)(Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET NOTE: Duplicates of ECF #1, 2, and 3 received. Email attached. (Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Attachments: #1 Email)(Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Email)(Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET NOTE: Duplicates of ECF #1, 2, and 3 received. Email attached. (Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Attachments: #1 Email)(Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Potter, Carrie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Email)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Johnson and Wales University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Nicholas Ermilo Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Ciao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Wales University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Ann Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Warwick Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?