Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca v. Thielsch Engineering Inc
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Thielsch Engineering Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Light Efficient Design, LLC and Graybar Electric Co
Case Number: 1:2020cv00342
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Third Party Complaint by Graybar Electric Co.(Ruggieri, James)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Ruggieri on behalf of Graybar Electric Co (Ruggieri, James)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Light Efficient Design, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Graybar Electric Co. (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Request filed by Thielsch Engineering Inc. (Walsh, David)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by Thielsch Engineering Inc. (Walsh, David)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Konzelmann. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 9/9/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Christopher Konzelmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1546826 ) filed by Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Admissions for Movant)(Keough, Timothy)
September 7, 2020 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Graybar Electric Co, Light Efficient Design, LLC, filed by Thielsch Engineering Inc.(Walsh, David)
September 7, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Thielsch Engineering Inc.(Walsh, David)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca. Thielsch Engineering Inc served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Keough, Timothy)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Thielsch Engineering Inc. (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Thielsch Engineering Inc. (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca identifying Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Opus Investment Management, Inc. for Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca.. (Keough, Timothy)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca identifying Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Opus Investment Management, Inc. for Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca.. (Keough, Timothy)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1537914 ), filed by Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons)(Keough, Timothy)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1537914 ), filed by Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons)(Keough, Timothy)
August 10, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 10, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca v. Thielsch Engineering Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Thielsch Engineering Inc
Represented By: David R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of Ameirca
Represented By: Timothy J Keough
Represented By: Christopher Konzelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Light Efficient Design, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Graybar Electric Co
Represented By: James A. Ruggieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?