Kathy G. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kathy Guertin
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00346
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 10/16/2020. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Simoncelli, Michael).
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace H. Lawrence on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Lawrence, Candace)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding as moot in light of the filing fee being paid #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 9/1/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
September 1, 2020 New Case Filing Fee Paid $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0103-1544742 re Order,,,,,,,. (Maguire, Stephen)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathy Guertin. As currently presented, Plaintiff's in forma pauperis (IFP) application suggests that she may have the ability to pay the filing fee in light of the amount of money in her bank accounts; her ownership of a home, which she states is worth around $125,000; and her statement that her husband provides all the income from his job and pays all the bills. See Christian v. Warwick Realty, LLC, No. CA 14-152 S, 2014 WL 2434626, at *2 (D.R.I. May 29, 2014) (citing cases) (In making the determination whether a litigant is unable to pay [the initial filing fee], this Court must take into account not only the applicants personal income but also his other financial resources, including income and assets available from a spouse or family members who are part of the close family.). Accordingly, on or before September 3, 2020, Plaintiff is directed to supplement her financial affidavit with additional information about the approximate fair market value of her family home and the amount of the balance due on the mortgage, the fair market value of any assets owned by either Plaintiff or her husband (or both), provided that the asset is used by Plaintiff (such as a car), as well as the amount of the monthly loan payment and net owing on the loan (if any). Plaintiff should also provide details regarding her monthly expenses for housing, transportation, utilities and loan payments, and any other information pertinent to her claim of financial desperation. The Court will rule on the motion once the supplemental financial affidavit is received. If a supplement is not received, the Court will recommend that the motion be denied. Alternatively, Plaintiff need not file anything further in connection with the IFP application if she pays the $400 filing fee by September 3, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/13/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathy Guertin. (Maguire, Stephen)
August 12, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . The document attached to ECF 2 is a personal identifer statement, and has been re-docketed as ECF 3 . The filer should refile their Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 11, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Kathy Guertin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Personal Identifier Statement)(Maguire, Stephen)
August 11, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathy Guertin. (Maguire, Stephen)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Kathy Guertin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Personal Identifier Statement)(Maguire, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathy G. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Guertin
Represented By: Stephen P. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Candace H. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?