Stack v. Kuligowski et al
Plaintiff: Keith Z Stack and Kurt Z Stack
Defendant: Keith Fortier, Claudette Kuligowski, Jessica Migneault, Christine Medici and Town of Lincoln Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2020cv00350
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kurt Z Stack. Responses due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Letter sent to Kurt Z Stack requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is hereby ordered to serve the plaintiffs summons and complaint on the defendants. Plaintiffs application to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. After an initial screening of the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and out of deference to Plaintiff's pro se status, Plaintiff's complaint is accepted and shall be served on Defendants for a responsive pleading. This initial screening determination is without prejudice to any Rule 12(b)(6) challenges that any of Defendants may present in such responsive pleading to any of Plaintiff's claims.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/24/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
August 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 12, 2020 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kurt Z Stack. (Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Kurt Z Stack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2020 Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Keith Z Stack. (Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Keith Z Stack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stack v. Kuligowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Fortier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudette Kuligowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Migneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Medici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Lincoln Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Z Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Z Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?