Sterman, et al v. Brown University
Plaintiff: Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash, Grant Sterman, Declan McCarthy, Lily Seckendorf, Isabella Kearns, Danielle Benstock, Alexa Jacobs, Kate Dowling, Abby Dichter, Raghav Pemmireddy, John Paul Champa, Thomas Hogan, III, Rachel Mashek and Ahmed Amin
Defendant: Brown University
Case Number: 1:2020cv00358
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 HEARING CANCELLED: The VIDEO Preliminary Injunction hearing scheduled for Tuesday, 10/27/20 at 10:00 a.m. before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is cancelled and will be rescheduled (Barletta, Barbara)
October 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/14/2020 with Attorneys Roberta Kaplan and Gabrielle Tenzer. (Telephone Conference at 5:38.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/14/2020. (Telephone Conference at 12:30.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 14, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with defendant only. Dial-in instructions emailed to counsel.(Saucier, Martha)
October 12, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/12/2020 with Attorneys Roberta Kaplan, Gabrielle Tenzer and Eileen Goldgeier. (Telephone Conference at 11:35.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/11/2020 with Attorneys Roberta Kaplan, Gabrielle Tenzer and Eileen Goldgeier. (Telephone Conference at 1:30.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/11/2020 with Attorney Stacey Nakasian. (Telephone Conference at 12:30.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/10/2020 with Attorney Stacey Nakasian. (Video Conference at 3:17.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 10/9/2020. (Video Conference at 3:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 9, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: VIDEO Settlement Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. with plaintiffs only. (Saucier, Martha)
October 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/8/2020 with Attorney Roberta Kaplan. (Telephone Conference at 9:06.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/8/2020 with Attorneys Stacey Nakasian and Jared Sugerman. (Telephone Conference at 8:30.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne O'Toole. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/8/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mahrah Taufique. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/8/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
October 8, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Anne O'Toole to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1557016 ) filed by Brown University. (Corrente, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Mahrah Taufique to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1557015 ) filed by Brown University. (Corrente, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/7/2020 with Attorneys Gabrielle Tenzer and Robert Kaplan. (Telephone Conference at 6:44.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 7, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with plaintiffs' counsel only. Dial-in instructions to be sent by email. (Saucier, Martha)
October 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/7/2020 with Attorneys Eileen Goldgeier, Yotam Barkai, Gabrielle Tenzer and Roberta Kaplan. (Telephone Conference at 8:45.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2020 with Attorneys Yotam Barkai, Gabrielle Tenzer and Roberta Kaplan. ( Telephone Conference at 11:50.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2020 with Attorneys Stacey Nakasian and Jared Sugerman. (Telephone Conference at 11:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2020 with Attorneys Yotam Barkai, Roberta Kaplan and Gabrielle Tenzer. (Telephone Conference at 9:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. with Plaintiffs' counsel only. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. (Saucier, Martha)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with Defendant's counsel only. Dial -in information to be emailed to counsel. (Saucier, Martha)
October 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/5/2020 with Attorneys Roberta Kaplan, Yotam Barkai and Gabrielle Tenzer. (Telephone Conference at 2:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/5/2020 with Attorneys Stacey Nakasian and Jared Sugerman. (Telephone Conference at 12:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with defendant's counsel only. Dial-in instructions to be emailed to counsel.(Saucier, Martha)
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. with plaintiff's counsel only. Dial in instructions will be emailed to counsel. (Saucier, Martha)
October 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/2/2020 with Attorneys Stacey Nakasian and Jared Sugerman. (Telephone Conference at 11:11.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/2/2020 with Attorneys Roberta Kaplan, Robert Corrente, Gabrielle Tenzer, Christopher Dawson and Yotam Barkai. (Telephone Conference at 10:31.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/2/2020 with Attorneys Stacey Nakasian, Jared Sugerman, Roberta Kaplan, Yotam Barkai, Gabrielle Tenzer, Robert Corrente and Christopher Dawson. (Telephone Conference at 10:03.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 1, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with plaintiffs' counsel only.Dial in instructions to be emailed to counsel.(Saucier, Martha)
October 1, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with counsel for defendants only. Dial in instructions will be emailed to counsel.(Saucier, Martha)
October 1, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with all counsel of record to discuss scheduling of settlement conference. Dial in instructions to be emailed to counsel. (Saucier, Martha)
October 1, 2020 HEARING CANCELLED re Telephone Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan has been cancelled. Court to reschedule for tomorrow 10/2/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
October 1, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Dial in information to be provided to counsel by email.(Saucier, Martha)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition #23 is DENIED. The deposition of Coach le Gassick shall take place on October 13, 2020 in order to accommodate Mr. Corrente's trial schedule. If the Plaintiffs feel that they are in need of an amendment to the scheduling order to give them additional time in light of this late deposition, they should request such an extension and the Court will grant it - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/30/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 30, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response re #24 Response to Motion to Compel Deposition filed by Ahmed Amin, Danielle Benstock, John Paul Champa, Abby Dichter, Kate Dowling, Thomas Hogan, III, Alexa Jacobs, Isabella Kearns, Rachel Mashek, Declan McCarthy, Raghav Pemmireddy, Lily Seckendorf, Grant Sterman. (Nakasian, Stacey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE In Opposition to #23 MOTION to Compel Deposition filed by Brown University. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Corrente, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendant shall respond to the #23 MOTION to Compel Deposition on or before Thursday, 10/1/20- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/29/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 29, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Deposition filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nakasian, Stacey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Ahmed Amin, Danielle Benstock, John Paul Champa, Abby Dichter, Kate Dowling, Thomas Hogan, III, Alexa Jacobs, Isabella Kearns, Rachel Mashek, Declan McCarthy, Raghav Pemmireddy, Lily Seckendorf, Grant Sterman Dismissing Thomas Hogan, III (Nakasian, Stacey)
September 21, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan to conduct a Settlement Conference. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs seek to limit discovery, claiming certain document requests are outside the scope of discovery permitted by Rule 26(b)(1). After reviewing the parties' filings, the Court finds that Document Requests 1 and 10 are not relevant to Defendant's defense. Even if certain documents in the requests had tangential relevance, the requests are not proportional to the needs of the case. Plaintiffs have represented that they have responded to all requests for documents relevant to the question of whether a contract was formed between the parties. Plaintiffs' Motion to Limit Discovery #17 is GRANTED - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/17/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion Response re #20 Reply to Response filed by Brown University. (Kaplan, Roberta)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response re #19 Response to Motion to Limit Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nakasian, Stacey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE In Opposition to #17 MOTION for Discovery Rule 26 Motion to Limit Discovery filed by Brown University. Replies due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Corrente, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N. Dawson on behalf of Brown University (Dawson, Christopher)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Limit Discovery #17 on or before Tuesday, September 15, 2020 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/11/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Discovery Rule 26 Motion to Limit Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nakasian, Stacey)
September 3, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction :VIDEO Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Zoom instructions will be provided to counsel of record prior to the hearing. Public Access information may be obtained on the Court's website (Barletta, Barbara)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash. Responses due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(Nakasian, Stacey)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRE-HEARING SCHEDULING ORDER - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brown University, filed by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash.(Nakasian, Stacey)
August 25, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 8/25/2020; counsel of record participated (Barletta, Barbara)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Hearing filed by Brown University. Replies due by 8/28/2020. (Corrente, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yotam Barkai filed by Robert Clark Corrente. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/21/2020. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Yotam Barkai to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1541935 ) filed by Brown University. (Corrente, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 EXHIBIT M - AFFIDAVIT by Alexa Jabobs (notarized version) IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash (Barletta, Barbara)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash (Nakasian, Stacey)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Roberta A. Kaplan ; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gabrielle E. Tenzer. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/19/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Gabrielle E. Tenzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1541030 ) filed by Brown University. (Corrente, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Roberta A. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1541027 ) filed by Brown University. (Corrente, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clark Corrente on behalf of Brown University (Corrente, Robert)
August 19, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, 8/25/2020 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Call in instructions will be provided to counsel of record(Barletta, Barbara)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Hearing filed by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash. Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nakasian, Stacey)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash. Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(Nakasian, Stacey)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. District Judge Mary S. McElroy longerger assigned to the case. CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 92-197-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brown University. (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash, by its Trustee Grant Sterman. (Nakasian, Stacey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1540180 ), filed by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash, by its Trustee Grant Sterman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nakasian, Stacey)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. District Judge Mary S. McElroy longerger assigned to the case. CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 92-197-JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brown University. (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash, by its Trustee Grant Sterman. (Nakasian, Stacey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1540180 ), filed by Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash, by its Trustee Grant Sterman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nakasian, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterman, et al v. Brown University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association for the Reinstatement of Brown Squash
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Sterman
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Declan McCarthy
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lily Seckendorf
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Kearns
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Benstock
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa Jacobs
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Dowling
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Dichter
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raghav Pemmireddy
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Champa
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hogan, III
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Mashek
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Amin
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Jared R. Sugerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University
Represented By: Mahrah Taufique
Represented By: Gabrielle E. Tenzer
Represented By: Yotam Barkai
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Christopher N. Dawson
Represented By: Anne O'Toole
Represented By: Roberta A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?