Laccinole v. Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Defendant: Gregory E. Schubert, Shantal Jackson and Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00359
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with both sides. Dial-in instructions to be emailed to both sides. (Saucier, Martha)
October 6, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/8/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Shantal Jackson, Gregory E. Schubert, Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC.(Simoncelli, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0285. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1540355, filed by Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal with Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Egan, Timothy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE by Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal)(Egan, Timothy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2020-0285. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1540355, filed by Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal with Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Egan, Timothy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE by Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal)(Egan, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laccinole v. Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory E. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantal Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Timothy O. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?