Walden-Doppke v. Jordan's Furniture, Inc.
Plaintiff: Helen Walden-Doppke
Defendant: Jordan's Furniture, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00360
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures shall be made by 10/9/20; Factual Discovery to close by 4/23/2021; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/4/2021; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/16/2021; Expert Discovery to close by 8/16/2021 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by by 9/27/2021- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/25/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 25, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 9/25/2020; Christopher Hultquist and Mario Nimock participated (Barletta, Barbara)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Jordan's Furniture, Inc.. (Nimock, Mario)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jordan's Furniture, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Jordan's Furniture, Inc... (Nimock, Mario)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 16 STATEMENT of Plaintiff by Helen Walden-Doppke. (Hultquist, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 9/25/2020 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Call in instructions will be provided to counsel of record prior to the conference (Barletta, Barbara)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Ferguson on behalf of Jordan's Furniture, Inc. (Ferguson, Andrew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Jordan's Furniture, Inc..(Nimock, Mario)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helen Walden-Doppke. Jordan's Furniture, Inc. served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Hultquist, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jordan's Furniture, Inc. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Helen Walden-Doppke. Civil Cover Sheet. (Hultquist, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Helen Walden-Doppke. Summons. (Hultquist, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1540438 ), filed by Helen Walden-Doppke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hultquist, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jordan's Furniture, Inc. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Helen Walden-Doppke. Civil Cover Sheet. (Hultquist, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Helen Walden-Doppke. Summons. (Hultquist, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1540438 ), filed by Helen Walden-Doppke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hultquist, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walden-Doppke v. Jordan's Furniture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan's Furniture, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew R. Ferguson
Represented By: Mario D. Nimock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Walden-Doppke
Represented By: Christopher E Hultquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?