Balasco v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julia Balasco
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. and Merck & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00364
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response re #11 Response to Motion to Strike filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Sangiamo, Dino)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE In Support to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Count VI of Plaintiff's Complaint (Non-Opposition) filed by Julia Balasco. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Esfandiari, Bijan)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Opposition to #10 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint filed by Julia Balasco. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Esfandiari, Bijan)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dino S. Sangiamo. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 9/23/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Responses due by 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Strike, #2 Proposed Order)(Dwyer, Paul)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Count VI of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Responses due by 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Dwyer, Paul)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Dino S. Sangiamo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1551984 ) filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Dwyer, Paul)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bijan Esfandiari, ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael L Baum; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole K.H. Maldonado, ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert F. Kennedy, Jr.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 8/31/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
August 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Robert F. Kennedy, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1544247 ) filed by Julia Balasco. (Hultquist, Christopher)
August 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Nicole K.H. Maldonado to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1544246 ) filed by Julia Balasco. (Hultquist, Christopher)
August 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Michael L. Baum to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1544245 ) filed by Julia Balasco. (Hultquist, Christopher)
August 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Bijan Esfandiari to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1544244 ) filed by Julia Balasco. (Hultquist, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1541000 ), filed by Julia Balasco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Merck & Co., Inc., #3 Summons-Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.)(Hultquist, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1541000 ), filed by Julia Balasco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Merck & Co., Inc., #3 Summons-Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.)(Hultquist, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balasco v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer
Represented By: Dino S. Sangiamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer
Represented By: Dino S. Sangiamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Balasco
Represented By: Christopher E Hultquist
Represented By: Nicole K.H. Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L Baum
Represented By: Robert F. Kennedy, Jr.
Represented By: Bijan Esfandiari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?