Charles v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Owen Charles
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and I.C. Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00386
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Moser, Albin)
October 15, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 10/30/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Moser, Albin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Albin Moser on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Moser, Albin)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Frank H. Kerney, III. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/15/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owen Charles. I.C. Systems, Inc. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Kerney, III, Frank)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owen Charles. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Kerney, III, Frank)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Frank Kerney to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1546349 ) filed by Owen Charles. (Knight, Jason)
September 4, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1546318 ), filed by Owen Charles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Experian, #3 Summons I.C. Systems)(Knight, Jason) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/10/2020) (Potter, Carrie).
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Frank Kerney to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1546349 ) filed by Owen Charles. (Knight, Jason)
September 4, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1546318 ), filed by Owen Charles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Experian, #3 Summons I.C. Systems)(Knight, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Charles
Represented By: Jason P. Knight
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Albin Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C. Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?