Bey v. Randstand Corporation
Plaintiff: E'Jai Bey
Defendant: Randstand Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00396
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND APPELLATE COVER SHEET: Abbreviated record on appeal consisting of notice of appeal, order(s) being appealed, and a certified copy of the district court docket report transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 11.0(b). #4 Notice of Appeal. Documents Sent: 2, 4 & Order entered 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 ROA)(McGuire, Vickie)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL by E'Jai Bey as to Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf Appeal Record due by 11/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The Plaintiff shall re-file his motion with the requested financial information or pay the initial filing fee of $400.00 on or before 10/26/2020. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/5/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by E'Jai Bey. (McGuire, Vickie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number IFP Pending ), filed by E'Jai Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by E'Jai Bey. (McGuire, Vickie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number IFP Pending ), filed by E'Jai Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Randstand Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randstand Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E'Jai Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?