Giuliano, Jr. v. Chapel Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Louis J. Giuliano, Jr.
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Household Finance Corporation II and Chapel Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00510
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Opposition to #7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complain and to Bar Plaintiff from Further Filings Without Leave of Court filed by Louis J. Giuliano, Jr.. Replies due by 2/10/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Simoncelli, Michael)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complain and to Bar Plaintiff from Further Filings Without Leave of Court ; Reset Deadlines: Response due by 2/3/2021.- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/23/2020. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complain and to Bar Plaintiff from Further Filings Without Leave of Court filed by Louis J. Giuliano, Jr.. Responses due by 1/5/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD received from defendants. (Potter, Carrie)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complain and to Bar Plaintiff from Further Filings Without Leave of Court filed by Household Finance Corporation II, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Responses due by 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chapel Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - HFC Note, #3 Exhibit C - HFC Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Discharge, #5 Exhibit E - Aff. of Lost Assignment, #6 Exhibit F - Foreclosure Deed, #7 Exhibit G - USDC RI Docket, #8 Exhibit H - USDC RI Complaint, #9 Exhibit I - Motion to Dismiss, #10 Exhibit J - Appeals Docket, #11 Exhibit K - Court of Appeals Order, #12 Exhibit L - Judgment, #13 Exhibit M - Quitclaim Deed, #14 Exhibit N - Motion for Final Judgment, #15 Exhibit O - Order Granting HFC's Motion, #16 Exhibit P - 2nd Appeal Docket, #17 Exhibit Q - Order Dismissing 2nd Appeal, #18 Exhibit R - Eviction Docket 1, #19 Exhibit S - Eviction Docket 2, #20 Exhibit T - Contesting Answer Eviction, #21 Exhibit U - Objection to MSJ Eviction)(Kiser, Brian)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying Corporate Parent Wilmington Savings Fund Society Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Wilmington Savings Fund Society Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.. (Kiser, Brian)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Michelle H. Badolato to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A Company IV, LLC ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1576321 ) filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Kiser, Brian)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Michelle H. Badolato to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Household Finance Corporation II ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1576319 ) filed by Household Finance Corporation II. (Kiser, Brian)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michelle H. Badolato filed by Brian M. Kiser ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac for Michelle H. Badolato filed by Brian M. Kiser. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/11/2020. (McGuire, Vickie)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Household Finance Corporation II identifying Corporate Parent HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings, PLC for Household Finance Corporation II.. (Kiser, Brian)
December 9, 2020 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 13-518 this case is permanently assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PM-2020-7824. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1574850, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Household Finance Corporation II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiser, Brian)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PM-2020-7824. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1574850, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Household Finance Corporation II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiser, Brian)
December 8, 2020 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 13-cv-518 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 8, 2020 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 13-cv-518 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giuliano, Jr. v. Chapel Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Brian M. Kiser
Represented By: Michelle H. Badolato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Finance Corporation II
Represented By: Brian M. Kiser
Represented By: Michelle H. Badolato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapel Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis J. Giuliano, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?