Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC et al v. Tierney et al
Plaintiff: Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC and Karissa Starcevich
Defendant: Amanda L. Tierney and Elizabeth M. Palmer
Case Number: 1:2020cv00513
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Elizabeth M. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Email received)(Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 DOCKET NOTE: Additional copy of filing received via email. Regarding: #15 Reply to Response, #14 MOTION to Vacate #10 Clerk's Entry of Default . (Hicks, Alyson)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re #12 Response to Motion filed by Elizabeth M. Palmer, Amanda L. Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Vacate #10 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Elizabeth M. Palmer, Amanda L. Tierney. Responses due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Lutrario on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lutrario, Ryan)
January 21, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE In Opposition to #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 1/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Indeglia, Vincent)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 1/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson)
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Elizabeth M. Palmer, Amanda L. Tierney (Hicks, Alyson)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by All Plaintiffs as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Indeglia, Vincent)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC. Elizabeth M. Palmer served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Indeglia, Vincent)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC. Amanda L. Tierney served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Indeglia, Vincent)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth M. Palmer, Amanda L. Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth M. Palmer, Amanda L. Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC. (Indeglia, Vincent)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC. (Indeglia, Vincent)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC. (Indeglia, Vincent)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC. (Indeglia, Vincent)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC, Karissa Starcevich. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC, Karissa Starcevich. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1575273 ), filed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC.(Indeglia, Vincent) (Main Document 1 replaced with corrected signature block on 12/9/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1575273 ), filed by Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC.(Indeglia, Vincent) (Main Document 1 replaced with corrected signature block on 12/9/2020) (Hicks, Alyson).
December 9, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY : This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. Regarding: #1 Complaint. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY : This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. Regarding: #1 Complaint. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 9, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC et al v. Tierney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda L. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth M. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lock & Key Portraits & Boudoir/ Studio XO, LLC
Represented By: Vincent A. Indeglia
Represented By: Ryan J. Lutrario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karissa Starcevich
Represented By: Vincent A. Indeglia
Represented By: Ryan J. Lutrario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?