Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Superior Fire & Electrical Services LTD et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Defendant: Taylor Made Home Improvements, Inc. and Superior Fire & Electrical Services LTD
Case Number: 1:2020cv00517
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER #5 granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to. Defendant's response to the complaint is due on or before February 21, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/5/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
January 4, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 First MOTION for an Extension of Time Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. Superior Fire & Electrical Services LTD served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. Taylor Made Home Improvements, Inc. served on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Defendant Superior Fire & Electrical Services, Ltd. Summons. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for an Extension of Time Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint , MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/4/2021. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide General Insurance Company.. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Superior Fire & Electrical Services LTD, Taylor Made Home Improvements, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Superior Fire & Electrical Services LTD, Taylor Made Home Improvements, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1575856 ), filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Superior Fire & Electrical Services LTD, #3 Summons to Taylor Made Home Improvements Inc.)(Lyons, Thomas)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1575856 ), filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Superior Fire & Electrical Services LTD, #3 Summons to Taylor Made Home Improvements Inc.)(Lyons, Thomas)
December 10, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 10, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Superior Fire & Electrical Services LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Made Home Improvements, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Fire & Electrical Services LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?