1900 Capital Trust II v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee and 1900 Capital Trust II
Defendant: John A. Santangelo, Jr., The United States of America, acting by and through the Department of the Treasury (Internal Revenue Service), Lynne B. Perry, State of Rhode Island, acting through its Department of Administration (Division of Taxation), The United State of America and State of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2020cv00519
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 1900 Capital Trust II. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/14/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by 1900 Capital Trust II Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Lynne B. Perry, John A. Santangelo, Jr., State of Rhode Island, The United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by 1900 Capital Trust II. (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by 1900 Capital Trust II. (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by 1900 Capital Trust II. (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by 1900 Capital Trust II. (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
December 14, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Inc. for 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.. (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee re #1 Complaint,, Notice of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1576662 ), filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 3 - Assignment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Loan Modification, #6 Exhibit 6 - Assignment, #7 Exhibit 7 - Assignment, #8 Exhibit 8 - Demands, #9 Exhibit 9 - Acceleration Letters, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Eastwood, Catherine)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Inc. for 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.. (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee re #1 Complaint,, Notice of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1576662 ), filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 3 - Assignment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Loan Modification, #6 Exhibit 6 - Assignment, #7 Exhibit 7 - Assignment, #8 Exhibit 8 - Demands, #9 Exhibit 9 - Acceleration Letters, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Eastwood, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1900 Capital Trust II v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Santangelo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America, acting by and through the Department of the Treasury (Internal Revenue Service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne B. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island, acting through its Department of Administration (Division of Taxation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United State of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee
Represented By: Catherine V. Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1900 Capital Trust II
Represented By: Catherine V. Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?